HI SB2355 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the director of public safety, in collaboration with the department of planning and permitting of the city and county of Honolulu, to make plans to utilize a public-private partnership to develop additional incarceration space at the Halawa correctional facility and for transit-oriented development near Oahu community correctional center. Report to the legislature.
Title
Transit-Oriented Development; Correctional Facility
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Reported from PGM/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2132) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-09-12 1:20PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to PGM/WLH, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |