HI SB2353 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination on the basis of sex, including gender identity or expression or sexual orientation, or disability, in any state educational program or activity or in any educational program or activity that receives state financial assistance. Takes effect 1/1/2019. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Discrimination In Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2446) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Espero, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Dela Cruz. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-12-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2139 (Same As) 2018-03-12 - Re-Referred to EDU, JDC.