HI SB235 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits deficiency judgment against a mortgagor after a short sale of residential real property pursuant to a foreclosure by action or foreclosure by power of sale.
Title
Mortgage Foreclosure; Deficiency Judgment Prohibited
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-04-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-11 8:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to CPN, JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=235 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB235_.HTM |