HI SB2346 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Act 115, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Act 115, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Address Confidentiality Program in the Department of the Attorney General to help survivors of domestic abuse, sexual assault, and stalking to relocate and keep the location of their physical address confidential. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Address Confidentiality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-06 | Senate | Act 115, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216). |
2018-07-06 | House | Act 115, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 141-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 141-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Luke, San Buenaventura, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Keith-Agaran, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:45PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:30PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 3:15PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 794). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Kim, L. Thielen. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Luke Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, Thielen. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 572). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1972-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola. |
2018-04-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:40PM in conference room 308. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-04-18. |
2018-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1366-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, C. Lee, McDermott. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 154) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2925) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Riviere, Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-18 12:05PM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2082) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2132 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7