HI SB2346 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the types of investment personnel that may be appointed by the ERS. Authorizes the ERS board to appoint investment professionals and support staff. Exempts appointed investment officers, professionals, and specialists from civil service law and collective bargaining. Provides option for incumbent investment specialists to remain subject to civil service law. Authorizes and requires the ERS to make direct payment to a spouse or former spouse of a system member or retirant of all or a portion of the member's or retirant's benefits pursuant to a Hawaii domestic relations order. Appropriates funds. (SB2346 HD1)
Title
ERS; Investment Personnel; Domestic Relations Order; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6). |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1157-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-18 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2016-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-18-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 144) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2765) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 1:15PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2118) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2125 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2