HI SB2346 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Effective 1/1/13, increases the vehicle weight tax and repeals the state portion of the fuel tax.
Title
State Fuel Tax; Vehicle Weight Tax
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee on WAM deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-10-12 11:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2346 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2346_.HTM |