HI SB2340 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Ensures certain benefits under the federal Affordable Care Act are preserved under Hawaii law, including: extending dependent coverage for adult children up to 26 years of age; prohibiting health insurance entities from imposing a preexisting condition exclusion; and prohibiting health insurance entities from using an individual's gender to determine premiums or contributions. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2018-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-18.
2018-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 19-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 19-18).
2018-04-23HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Ichiyama, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
2018-04-23SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-20SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-18 10:45AM in conference room 229.
2018-04-19SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-18 9:05AM in conference room 229.
2018-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2018-04-17HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788).
2018-04-17SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Tokuda.
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Ichiyama, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Tupola.
2018-04-10HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 778).
2018-04-10SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2018-04-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 506).
2018-04-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-04-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1890-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Holt, Todd.
2018-04-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2018-03-22HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5).
2018-03-22HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1315-18), recommending referral to FIN.
2018-03-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Mizuno, McDermott.
2018-03-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2018-03-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
2018-03-16HouseReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1177-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2018-03-13HouseThe committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2018-03-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2018-03-08HouseReferred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 152) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-03-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-02SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2711) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2018-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211.
2018-02-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-02-06SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2045) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara.
2018-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2018-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2126 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback