HI SB2331 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the agribusiness development corporation to implement the recommendations of "The Demand for Interisland Shipping and the Impact of Shipping Costs on Hawaii Agricultural Production" report, prepared for the agribusiness development corporation in 2008. Requires the agribusiness development corporation to report to the legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the regular session of 2013. (SD1)
Title
Agribusiness Development Corporation; Interisland Shipping
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Reported from AGL/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2136) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Dela Cruz, Kahele, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Gabbard, Slom. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to AGL/TIA, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |