HI SB2326 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 7/1/2021: bans the manufacture of a personal care product, except a non-prescription drug, that contains synthetic plastic microbeads. Beginning 7/1/2022: bans the sale or offer for sale of a personal care product, except a non-prescription drug, that contains synthetic plastic microbeads and bans the manufacture of a non-prescription drug that contains synthetic plastic microbeads. Beginning 7/1/2023: bans the sale or offer for sale of a non-prescription drug that contains synthetic plastic microbeads. Specifically exempts rinse-off cosmetics and rinse-off cosmetics that are also non-prescription drugs regulated by the federal Microbead-Free Waters Act of 2015. Effective on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Microbeads.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har, San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1060-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, Thielen. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-12-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 203) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3267) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2785) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-20 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Manufacture or Sale
Non-prescription Drugs
Personal Care Products
Prohibition
Synthetic Plastic Microbeads
Non-prescription Drugs
Personal Care Products
Prohibition
Synthetic Plastic Microbeads