HI SB232 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - (H) Act 001, on 2/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - (H) Act 001, on 2/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the same rights, benefits, protections, and responsibilities of spouses in a marriage to partners in a civil union. Takes effect January 1, 2012. (SB232 HD1)
Title
Civil Unions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | (H) Act 001, on 2/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) Act 001, 2/23/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1101). | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 27). | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 18 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 5 No(es): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Kim, Slom. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Taniguchi. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Deferred until 02-16-11. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) One Day Notice 02-15-11. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 02-15-11. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 8). | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Chang, Ching, Choy, Cullen, Fontaine, Har, Johanson, Manahan, Mizuno, Pine, Riviere, Souki, Takai, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward, Yamane voting no (19) and Representative(s) Cabanilla excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Chang, Manahan, Ching, Choy, Cullen, Fontaine, Har, Johanson, Mizuno, Riviere, Souki, Takai, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward, Yamane voting no (18) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 156) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Morita, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Souki, Fontaine; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, McKelvey. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-08-11 2:15PM in House conference room Auditorium. | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 5 | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 4). | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 19; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 6 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero, Gabbard, Kim, Kouchi, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 01-28-11. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 20. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fukunaga, Taniguchi). | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has rescheduled its public hearing to 01-25-11 10:00AM in the Auditorium. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-11 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |