HI SB2315 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act 147, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act 147, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the PSD to provide substance abuse treatment services to Halawa Correctional Facility inmates. (CD1)
Title
Appropriation; Department of Public Safety; Substance Abuse Treatment ($)
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Act 147, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250). |
2014-06-26 | House | Act 147, on 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250). |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 139-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 139-14). |
2014-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 4:00PM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 2:45PM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 2:45PM in conference room 312. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Ing Co-Chairs; Takayama, McDermott Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 556). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1568-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Woodson. |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2). |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1034-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-13 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takayama, Yamane, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi, McDermott. |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-13-14 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 155) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2623) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2212) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 3:45PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |