HI SB2313 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of human services to allow persons to conduct child and vulnerable adult abuse perpetrator checks on the department's website as part of background checks for employment, volunteer, licensure, or certification purposes.
Title
Child Abuse; Adult Abuse; Background Checks
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee on HMS deferred the measure. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to HMS, JDL. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2195 (Same As) 2012-01-23 - (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2313 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2313_.HTM |