HI SB2303 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Youth Services to coordinate a two-year Safe Places for Youth Pilot Program in partnership with private organizations to coordinate a network that youth can access for safety and where youth can obtain advice, guidance, programs, and services. Establishes a Safe Places for Youth Pilot Program Coordinator position. Requires a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Youth.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2259) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-18 3:45PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2157 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - Referred to HHS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 8
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
At-Risk Youth
Coordinator Position
Keiki Caucus
Report
Safe Places for Youth Pilot Program
At-Risk Youth
Coordinator Position
Keiki Caucus
Report
Safe Places for Youth Pilot Program
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2303&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2303_.HTM |