HI SB2298 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 162, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1264).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Act 162, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1264).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act, which provides authority to plan for the management and disposition of digital assets. (CD1)
Title
Uniform Acts; Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act; Digital Assets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Act 162, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1264). |
2016-06-30 | House | Act 162, on 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1264). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 114-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 114-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Rhoads, Nishimoto, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-16 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-16 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran, Galuteria Co-Chairs; Kidani, Slom. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 525). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1651-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:31PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1240-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2016-03-21 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1103-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, C. Lee, Nakashima, McDermott. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-16-16 2:00PM. |
2016-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-14-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2016-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 44) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2558) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2124) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2115 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM.