HI SB2296 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that membership of each metropolitan planning organization policy board include at least one member of the senate and one member of the house of representatives from that metropolitan planning area. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Metropolitan Planning Organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 135) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Rhoads, Riviere . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2708) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2292) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, English, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 9:00AM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |