HI SB2289 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires nursing home administrator to make application for a state civil identification certificate on behalf of a resident of the nursing home who cannot appear in person due to infirmity.
Title
State Civil Identification
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] |
Sen. Gary Hooser [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JGO. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2011) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JGO. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-10 1:50pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to HMS, JGO. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2148 (Same As) 2010-01-22 - (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, JUD, referral sheet 3