HI SB2280 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HLT/LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HLT/LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain contracts for managed care entered into after June 30, 2020, from containing a provision that authorizes a pharmacy benefit manager to reimburse a contracting pharmacy on a maximum allowable cost basis, and voids any such provisions in existing managed care contracts. Prohibits pharmacy benefit managers from engaging in self-serving or deceptive business practices. Prohibits pharmacy benefit managers from engaging in unfair methods of competition or unfair practices. Prohibits pharmacy benefit managers from retaining any portion of spread pricing. Prohibits a pharmacy benefit manager from reimbursing a 340B pharmacy differently than any other network pharmacy. Prohibits a pharmacy benefit manager from reimbursing an independent or rural pharmacy an amount less than the rural rate for each drug under certain circumstances. Prohibits a pharmacy benefit manager from prohibiting a pharmacist to provide certain information to insureds. Increases pharmacy benefit managers' annual reporting requirements. Requires the insurance commissioner to file annual reports with the legislature. Increases pharmacy benefit manager registration and renewal fees. Makes certain violations of pharmacy benefit managers subject to the penalties provided in chapter 480 and chapter 481, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Pharmacy Benefit Managers.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT/LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 186) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3133) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:30PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2747) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-12-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-11-20 10:15AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 01-31-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Independent or Rural Pharmacies
Insurance Commissioner
Licensure
Pharmacy Benefit Managers
Reporting
Rural Rate of Reimbursement
Insurance Commissioner
Licensure
Pharmacy Benefit Managers
Reporting
Rural Rate of Reimbursement