HI SB2274 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 34
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 34
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of SPRBs to assist Hawaii Pacific Health in financing, refinancing, and/or reimbursing costs related to the acquisition or construction of health care facilities. Effective date 07/01/2050.
Title
Hawaii Pacific Health; Special Purpose Revenue Bonds
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 34 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 113) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2457) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Fukunaga, Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:05AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2093) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-01-10 2:30pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |