HI SB227 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB227
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provision requiring light transmittance of no less than 35% on side and rear windows of certain vehicles when using sun screening devices and glazing material. Exempts from the section the side windows of any motor vehicle; provided the vehicle is equipped with rearview mirrors on both sides. Takes effect 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Sun Screening Devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 177) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:05PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB227 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.