HI SB2259 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the offense of computer fraud in the first degree to obtaining or attempting to obtain confidential personal information of another or information relating to the transfer of possession, control, or ownership of property of another, through communication conducted at least in part by computer.
Title
Computer Fraud; Computer Scammers; Social Networking Sites
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-15-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT will hold a public decision making on 02-13-12 2:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-08-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-12 2:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to EDT, JDL. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2259 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2259_.HTM |