HI SB2251 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 37
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 37
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates, organizes, and clarifies current campaign financing laws. Effective November 2, 2010, and applies to reporting periods beginning after November 2, 2010. (SD1)
Title
Elections; Campaign Financing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 37 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 104) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Espero, Gabbard, Green, Hooser, Ige, Ihara, Kidani, Nishihara, Slom, Tokuda, Tsutsui . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2510) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Slom. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-22-10 11:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-10 10:00am in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |