HI SB2250 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Hawaii paroling authority to use a continuum of administrative sanctions when a parolee violates a term or condition of parole. Effective January 1, 2025. (SB2250 HD1)
Title
Parole; Administrative Sanctions
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1279-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Tsuji, Fontaine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souki, Marumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-21-12 2:15PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1057-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souki. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 03-15-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to PBM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 123) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Deferred until 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) One Day Notice 03-02-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2503) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-27-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-06 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2026) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-12 3:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to PGM, JDL. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |