HI SB2247 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - (S) Act 094, 4/30/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - (S) Act 094, 4/30/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows electronic communication service providers to divulge the contents of a communication to law enforcement agencies, public safety agencies, and public safety answering points under certain emergency circumstances. (SB2247 HD1)
Title
Electronic Communication Service Providers; Disclosure; Emergencies
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | (S) Act 094, 4/30/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195). | |
2012-04-30 | (H) Act 094, on 4/30/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 749). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Kim. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Re-referred to JUD, PBM, CPC, referral sheet 65 | |
2012-04-13 | (S) One Day Notice 04-16-12. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-16-12. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-04-12 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 465). | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) Deferred until 04-04-12. | |
2012-04-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 350). | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Souki voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Saiki, Wooley excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Manahan, Wooley excused (4). | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1411-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Thielen. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-13-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 120) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2676) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-29 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Green, Slom. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-29-12 10:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-28-12 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2005) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2012-01-26 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-12 2:50PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to PGM, CPN. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |