HI SB2239 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to require justices and judges be elected to serve six-year terms and be subject to the consent of the senate for subsequent judicial terms, authorize the governor and chief justice be authorized to make interim appointments for vacancies in the offices of the chief justice, supreme court, intermediate appellate court, and circuit courts, or district courts, respectively, and repeal the judicial selection commission. Ratification upon general election of 2018.
Title
Constitutional Amendment; Justices and Judges; Election; Interim Appointments; Tenure; Judicial Selection Commission (ConAm)
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-02-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2139 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2239&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2239_.HTM |