HI SB2239 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 240, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 240, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts grants made under the community-based economic development program from the Hawaii public procurement code; clarifies that moneys in the hydrogen investment capital special fund shall be expended by the Hawaii strategic development corporation; repeals the high technology innovation corporation on 6/30/2013. (CD1)
Title
Community-Based Economic Development; Hydrogen Investment Capital Special Fund; High Technology Innovation Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 240, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 240, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1343). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-04 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 728). | |
2012-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 839). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-03-12 | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 127-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 127-12). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ryan. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Marumoto. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 5:15PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 4:45PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 3:15PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 9:45AM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 4:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 1:15PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-12 1:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-12 2:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Ryan. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Coffman, Choy Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Marumoto. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 426). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1585-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-29-12 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Chang, Herkes, Nakashima excused (3). | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1182-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Cabanilla, Chang, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Herkes, Ito. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-20-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1080-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Evans, Hashem, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Nishimoto, Pine. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 03-13-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to ERB, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 118) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2606) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ryan. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on on 02-23-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Reported from EDT/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2116) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ryan. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/PGM deferred the measure until 02-03-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/PGM deferred the measure until 02-01-12 2:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-12 2:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to EDT/PGM, WAM. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |