HI SB2233 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, McKelvey, Pine, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, McKelvey, Pine, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes government agencies to give or publish notice electronically or in a daily or weekly publication of statewide circulation, or in a daily or weekly publication in the affected county, as appropriate; appropriates funds for the operational expenses of the office of information management and technology; appropriates funds for the Hawaii state public library system for public access support services. Effective July 1, 2012, with electronic notice requirement to take effect on July 1, 2013. (SB2233 HD1)
Title
Electronic Information; Public Notice; Appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, McKelvey, Pine, Thielen, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1277-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Carroll, Ito, Luke, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Coffman, Herkes. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-20-12 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-12. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-15-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 113) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2604) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Reported from EDT/PGM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2280) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ryan. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-08-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/PGM deferred the measure until 02-08-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/PGM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to EDT/PGM/JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |