HI SB2230 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes a statewide limitation on consumer fireworks, except by permit for use at cultural events.
Title
Relating To Fireworks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee on TCA deferred the measure. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 3:01PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TCA, JDC. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1888 (Same As) 2024-02-01 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2230&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2230_.HTM |