HI SB2224 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the convention center enterprise special fund as the convention center operations and maintenance special fund, repeals the allocation of transient accommodations tax revenues to that fund, amends the allowable uses of that fund, and adds a cap to the amount of moneys deposited into the fund. Defines administrative expenses as used in section 201B-11(c), HRS, as office equipment, salaries, and supplies. Caps the amount of money from the tourism special fund that can be used for research and sports marketing expenses. Redistributes transient accommodations tax revenue from the Hawaii tourism authority to different state agencies for certain purposes. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Tourism.
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 121) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2936) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-02-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-18 10:45AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-28-18 11:15AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:08AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2496) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, L. Thielen. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-18 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to ETT, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to ETT/PSM, CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |