HI SB2222 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys as a grant-in-aid to the Emergency Services Department of the City and County of Honolulu. Declares that the appropriation exceeds the state general fund expenditure ceiling for 2024-2025.
Title
Making An Appropriation To The Department Of Emergency Services Of The City And County Of Honolulu.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2563) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Awa. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 4:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1852 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).