HI SB2220 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits an employer from suspending, discharging, or discriminating against an employee for testing positive for cannabis if the employee is a registered qualifying patient who is authorized for the medical use of cannabis. Provides certain exceptions. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Employment Practices.
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2298) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to LBR, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to LBR/PSM, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Employees
Employers
Employment Practices
Medical Use of Cannabis
Registered Qualifying Patient
Substance Abuse Testing
Unlawful Suspension, Discharge, or Discrimination
Employers
Employment Practices
Medical Use of Cannabis
Registered Qualifying Patient
Substance Abuse Testing
Unlawful Suspension, Discharge, or Discrimination