HI SB222 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB222
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the sales of mobility enhancing equipment, durable medical equipment, prosthetic devices, prescription drugs sold pursuant to a doctor's prescription, diabetic supplies, medical oxygen, and human blood and its derivatives from the general excise tax for the taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018. Amends the definitions of "prosthetic device" and "prescription drugs". (SB222 HD1)
Title
Relating To The General Excise Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1450-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 03-21-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 58) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2780) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:08AM in conference room 211. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 58) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB21 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB222 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB222 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.