HI SB222 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys as a grant for the continued operation of the PATH Clinic. (SD1)
Title
Perinatal Care; Appropriation; Grant
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 35) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 01-31-11 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |