HI SB2213 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Aquino, Ching, Choy, Finnegan, M. Lee, Marumoto, Pine, Takai, Tokioka, Ward voting no (10) and Representative(s) Berg, Keith-Agaran, Manahan, Takumi, Thielen excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-12 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Aquino, Ching, Choy, Finnegan, M. Lee, Marumoto, Pine, Takai, Tokioka, Ward voting no (10) and Representative(s) Berg, Keith-Agaran, Manahan, Takumi, Thielen excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that each county has the power to establish compassion centers for the dispensing of medical marijuana. Requires that compassion centers shall only provide service to qualifying patients and primary caregivers registered with the department of public safety. Makes compassion centers subject to the general excise tax by making inapplicable the exemption for amounts received from sales of prescription drugs or prosthetic devices. Imposes a general excise tax on marijuana sales. Imposes registration fee on compassion centers, to be shared with counties. Effective August 7, 2112. (SB2113 HD1)
Title
Counties; Compassion Centers
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Aquino, Ching, Choy, Finnegan, M. Lee, Marumoto, Pine, Takai, Tokioka, Ward voting no (10) and Representative(s) Berg, Keith-Agaran, Manahan, Takumi, Thielen excused (5). | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Reported from PBS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 716-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Bertram, Brower, Carroll, Shimabukuro; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Finnegan; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Belatti, Mizuno. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Rhoads, Souki, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Saiki; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pine; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Takumi. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS/HLT on Thursday, 03-11-10 10:45AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to PBS/HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 35 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 97) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 4 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Sakamoto, Slom, Tsutsui). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Nishihara). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2480) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Tsutsui ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-22-10 10:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-10 9:45AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Reported from TIA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2185) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, English, Gabbard, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA deferred the measure until 02-10-10 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA deferred the measure until 02-08-10 2:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-09-10 1:25pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 1:30pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Referred to TIA/PSM, WAM. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |