HI SB2203 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state departments and agencies to transfer certain electronic devices to the Department of Accounting and General Services, which may refurbish and distribute these devices to eligible entities in the State or eligible private persons, as determined by rule.
Title
Relating To Sustainable Electronics Management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 3:30PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/EET, WAM/JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO/EET, WAM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2203&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2203_.HTM |