HI SB2203 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies the registration process for stored vehicles with expired license plates.
Title
Relating To Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1693 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2203&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2203_.HTM |