HI SB2195 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides liability protections for public and private landowners who expressly allow access and use of their land to practitioners of native Hawaiian traditional and customary practices. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Landowner Liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2490) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1784 (Same As) 2020-01-29 - The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Landowner Liability
Native Hawaiian Traditional and Customary Practices
Office of Hawaiian Affairs (OHA) Package
Native Hawaiian Traditional and Customary Practices
Office of Hawaiian Affairs (OHA) Package