HI SB2183 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain department of education employees from the state residency requirement under certain circumstances. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Department Of Education Residency Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2). |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1240-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2022-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 155) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2998) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2333) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 3:20PM; Conference Room 229 + videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |