HI SB2180 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 45
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 45
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an application and notification process for the consideration of executive pardons. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Executive Pardons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 148) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3258) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-20 12:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2325) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-20 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1740 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).