HI SB2179 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes drug paraphernalia possession and delivery offenses from felonies to civil violations.
Title
Drug Paraphernalia; Possession and Delivery; Civil Violations
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-17-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-16-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-16-16 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 8:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1809 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2179&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2179_.HTM |