HI SB2173 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an electric utility to own, operate, lease, plan, construct, install, maintain, and replace broadband facilities, including middle mile infrastructure, to help facilitate the development of and investment in broadband facilities and services to rural, unserved, underserved, and urban communities throughout the State. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Broadband Service Infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2015) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EET, CPN. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1782 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.