HI SB2151 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires medical facilities filing for bankruptcy to inform every patient or former patient by written notice prior to filing for bankruptcy that the patient or former patient is entitled to a copy of the patient's or former patient's own medical records at no charge. Requires the medical facilities to provide a paper or electronic copy of the medical records to the patient or former patient upon request.
Title
Medical Records; Medical Facilities; Bankruptcy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2151&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2151_.HTM |