HI SB2137 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the taxing authority of the counties.
Title
Relating To County Taxing Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1664 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2137&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2137_.HTM |