HI SB2131 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Act 076, 06/20/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Act 076, 06/20/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that naphtha fuel, used in a power-generating facility, is subject to the fuel tax at a rate of 2 cents per gallon retroactive to January 1, 2016. Clarifies the deposit requirements of the high technology special fund. (CD1)
Title
Naphtha Fuel; Fuel Tax; Power Generation; High Technology Special Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | Senate | Act 076, 06/20/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177). |
2016-06-21 | House | Act 076, on 06/20/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 157-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 157-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Luke, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamashita. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Tokuda, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 9:00AM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-16 9:00AM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-16 9:10AM in conference room 225. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Nishihara, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Luke Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Pouha. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 516). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1695-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-07-16 2:01PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1281-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Say, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Pouha. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-22-16 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-17 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-22-16. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-17-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 107) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2577) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Harimoto. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-11-16 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2015) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, Chun Oakland, English, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-16 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |