HI SB213 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of public safety to establish performance indicators; requires reports, using key performance indicators, to be provided to the legislature. (SD1)
Title
Inmate Rehabilitation; Reentry System; Performance Indicators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2009-03-23 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1136), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-19 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Yamashita, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. | |
2009-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-19-09 10:00 AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 28 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 124) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Hee). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 568) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Bunda, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-12-09 1:15 PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-10-09 1:15 pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-09 1:15pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to PSM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |