HI SB2127 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Re-Referred to HTH/TRS, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Re-Referred to HTH/TRS, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the noise pollution task force within the Department of Health to investigate noise pollution and provide recommendations on how to better regulate excessive noise pollution throughout the State, from both stationary and non-stationary sources. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Noise Pollution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/TRS, JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HTH/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2435) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, DeCoite, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:15PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HTH/TRS, JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1545 (Same As) 2022-02-23 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.