HI SB2123 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies county zoning authority by distinguishing single-family residential use from single-family vacation rental use and allowing amortization by ordinance for single-family transient vacation rentals over a reasonable period. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD1)
Title
HSAC Package; Zoning; Counties; Authority; Single-Family Residential; Vacation Rental Use
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 106) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Deferred until 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2519) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2302) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Inouye ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-16 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPH. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1646 (Same As) 2016-01-25 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1