HI SB2113 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits manufacturers and contract testing facilities in Hawaii from using animal test methods for the purpose of testing cosmetics or household products for which an alternative test method is available. Imposes a civil fine and authorizes the attorney general to seek injunctive relief and any other recovery of damages. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Animals.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1484-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ing. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-21-18 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 99) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2607) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Wakai. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-18 9:55AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-21-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from AEN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2402) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/CPH deferred the measure until 02-14-18 2:05PM in conference room 224. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-18 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |