HI SB2109 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to investigate the improper disposal of household and consumer products containing volatile organic compounds as a nuisance and requires the department to abate, destroy, remove, or prevent the nuisance. Requires the director of health to consider the improper disposal of household and consumer products containing volatile organic compounds when identifying categories of nonpoint sources that add significant pollution to certain state waters. Requires the department of health to develop and provide information to the public on the potential dangers of volatile organic compounds, proper disposal of household and consumer products containing volatile organic compounds, and alternative unscented household and consumer products.
Title
Relating To Volatile Organic Compounds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Disposal of Household and Consumer Products
Nonpoint Source Pollution
Nuisance
Volatile Organic Compounds
Nonpoint Source Pollution
Nuisance
Volatile Organic Compounds
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2109&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2109_.HTM |