HI SB2109 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Referred to TIA/PSM/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Referred to TIA/PSM/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the counties and the State to maintain roads whose ownership is in dispute without incurring liability.
Title
HSAC Package (3); Roads in Limbo; Liability; Road Maintenance
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Senate | Referred to TIA/PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1610 (Same As) 2014-02-03 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2109&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2109_.HTM |