HI SB2104 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates standards and procedures for income-withholding for purposes of enforcing restitution orders. Amends the definition of "debt" relating to the recovery of money owed to the State to include court-ordered restitution subject to civil enforcement. Provides priority of income withholding orders. Extends victims' access to adult probation records to include access to payment compliance records. Requires that any bail posted by a defendant be applied toward payment of any court-ordered restitution in the same case. Makes permanent Act 119, SLH 2011, which allows certain adult probation records to be provided to certain case management, assessment, or treatment service providers upon the screening for admission, acceptance, or admittance of the defendant into a treatment program. Extends for an additional two years the increase in percentage deducted from inmates' earnings for restitution payments pursuant to Act 139, SLH 2012. Appropriates funds. (SB2104 HD1)
Title
Honolulu Prosecuting Attorney Package; Crime Victims; Restitution; Collection; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) McDermott replaced Representative(s) Pouha as conferee(s). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Chun Oakland Co-Chair; Shimabukuro. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Johanson Co-Chairs; Cullen, Pouha. |
2016-04-18 | House | Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 513). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1623-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:31PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-04-04 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 102) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2795) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-16 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2367) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1660 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).